RI S0451 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Elections -- Mail Ballots (would Require That Envelopes Containing Mail Ballots Be Marked With A Statement Noting, In Part, That The Board Of Elections Must Receive The Mail Ballot Envelope "not Later Than 8:00 Pm The Day Of The Election." The Present Law Is Nine O'clock.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Elections -- Mail Ballots (would Require That Envelopes Containing Mail Ballots Be Marked With A Statement Noting, In Part, That The Board Of Elections Must Receive The Mail Ballot Envelope "not Later Than 8:00 Pm The Day Of The Election." The Present Law Is Nine O'clock.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-02SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-03-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2013)
2013-02-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback