RI S0450 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the division of motor vehicles to create a special registration plate for private colleges and universities within the state.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2015) |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/03/2015) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2015) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |