RI S0447 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-09 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protects the rights of employees in the workplace relating to free speech, assembly and religion as well as attendance at employer-sponsored meetings regarding political or religious matters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Relations Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09HouseReferred to House Labor
2023-06-08SenateSenate read and passed
2023-06-01SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023)
2023-05-31SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-26SenateScheduled for consideration (05/31/2023)
2023-05-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023)
2023-02-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback