RI S0444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Water Pollution: would allow the director of the department of environmental management to record orders or notices regarding water pollution violations in the land evidence records
Title
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Water Pollution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | |
2011-05-04 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-23 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0444.pdf |