RI S0442 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that three (3)-wheeled motorcycles be included under the licensing requirements of the department of motor vehicles. Effective March 1, 2022.
Title
Three Wheel Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |