RI S0442 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the RI coastal adaptation trust fund which would enable cities and towns and the state to apply for grants to fund projects that invest in measures that adapt infrastructure on public lands to address the impacts of climate change.
Title
The Climate Change Coastal Adaptation Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2017) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |