RI S0436 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases taxable wage base for employee contributions to TDI/TCI fund/individual benefit rates for eligible individuals/maximum caregiver weeks/creates new credit for low wage tax payers not income eligible to receive benefits. Effective 1/1/22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Disability Insurance -- General Provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2021)
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback