RI S0435 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows happy hour drink specials served in conjunction with the purchase of a food item, which would include appetizers or entrees prepared on premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses -- Happy Hour

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023)
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback