RI S0435 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incorporates the federal affirmative action and nondiscrimination obligations of federal contractors and subcontractors regarding individuals with disabilities, utilization goal of three percent (3%) for employment of qualified individuals.
Title
Relating To Equal Opportunity And Affirmative Action Employment Of People With Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0435.pdf |