RI S0434 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grants paid sick leave and safe leave benefits to construction employees who work under multi-employer collective bargaining agreements, provided that certain conditions are met.
Title
Healthy And Safe Families And Workplace Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-20 | House | Meeting postponed (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |