RI S0430 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new definition for the term "employee", for purposes of wages, workers' compensation, temporary disability and unemployment insurance benefits, which deems a worker to be an employee, as opposed to an independent contractor.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0430.pdf |