RI S0430 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of New Shoreham to establish its own regulatory framework regarding transportation network company services.
Title
Transportation Network Company Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |