RI S0420 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the sealing of any district court file, where a resolution of a trespass and eviction complaint results in a verdict for the tenant and no appeal is taken.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Landlord And Tenant Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateMeeting postponed (03/11/2021)
2021-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback