RI S0418 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires conservation and preservation restrictions to be liberally interpreted in favor of the grants awarded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservation And Preservation Restrictions On Real Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18SenateSigned by Governor
2023-05-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-05-16HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2023-05-12HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (05/16/2023)
2023-05-09SenateSenate read and passed
2023-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/09/2023)
2023-04-27SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023)
2023-04-17SenateMeeting postponed (04/20/2023)
2023-04-14SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback