RI S0415 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Motor Fuel Tax (creates An 8 Member Commission Whose Purpose Is To Study And Make Recommendations On The Elimination Of The Motor Fuel Tax, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly No Later Than March 1, 2016, And Whose Life Would Expire On May 1, 2016.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Motor Fuel Tax (creates An 8 Member Commission Whose Purpose Is To Study And Make Recommendations On The Elimination Of The Motor Fuel Tax, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly No Later Than March 1, 2016, And Whose Life Would Expire On May 1, 2016.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20HouseReferred to House Finance
2015-03-19SenateSenate read and passed
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/19/2015)
2015-03-10SenateCommittee recommends passage
2015-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2015)
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback