RI S0406 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Assents to the FDA Food Safety Modernization Act, and empowers the director of DEM to perform those acts necessary, to be in compliance with the provisions of the act for the modernization of the safety of the food supply.
Title
Assent To Food Safety Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |