RI S0403 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the "lookback" period for third and subsequent offenses involving driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs under § 31-27-2 and for offenses related to failure or refusal to submit to chemical tests under §31-27-2.1 from 5 years to 10 years.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0403.pdf |