RI S0399 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits nonregulated power producers from automatically renewing a contract. Mandates that the nonregulated power producer provide methods for the customer to cancel service and provide the customer with notice of the contract expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-25SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-22SenateScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-04-30SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback