RI S0398 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provision of law granting minors the ability to obtain a marriage license, and would require a person to be of full legal age, at least eighteen (18) years of age to obtain a marriage license.
Title
Marriage Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-01 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |