RI S0395 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a comprehensive scheme to help the department of corrections make appropriate least restrictive placements of prisoners within its facilities.
Title
Restrictive Housing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0395.pdf |