RI S0395 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a proration of the homestead exemption in cases where title to property passes from those not entitled to claim an exemption to those who are entitled.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |