RI S0393 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the new center for Chemical and Forensic Sciences at the University of Rhode Island the "The Richard E. Beaupre Center for Chemical and Forensic Sciences."
Title
Joint Committee On Naming New Buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/20/2015) |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2015) |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/25/2015) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |