RI S0391 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the number of members of the transit authority from eight to nine and would make the mayor of Providence or designee an ex officio member with voting privileges.
Title
Rhode Island Public Transit Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/15/2021) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |