RI S0388 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a penalty of $300 per month up to an aggregate total of $2,000 upon financial institutions failing to promptly record foreclosure deeds and pay outstanding taxes. Most holders of a private mortgage would be exempt from the penalty requirements.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |