RI S0386 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Placed on House Calendar (03/28/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Mp Cleaning Co. Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Mp Cleaning Co. Inc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/28/2019)
2019-03-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-03-15HouseScheduled for consideration (03/19/2019)
2019-03-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019)
2019-02-27HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-02-26SenateSenate read and passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/26/2019)

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback