RI S0383 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes guidelines for the family court to use to decide petitions for visitation by grandparents based on a best interest of the grandchild standard.
Title
Visitation Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/09/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |