RI S0373 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any applicant or holder of a retail license for the sale of alcoholic beverages be required to file a certificate of insurance evidencing liability insurance coverage in certain minimum amounts.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Meeting postponed (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |