RI S0367 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the tax rates for individuals, bankruptcy estates, trusts and estates.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0367.pdf |