RI S0362 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a transitioning veterans' small business loan program through the commerce corporation.
Title
Veterans - Small Business Loan Program
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Mark Gee [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0362.pdf |