RI S0357 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Rhode Island pari-mutuel facilities exemption to the public health and workplace safety act thereby banning smoking at all pari-mutuel facilities.
Title
Public Health And Workplace Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0357.pdf |