RI S0349 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the council on elementary and secondary education, in consultation with the RI department of education, to develop and approve statewide academic standards for the instruction of consumer education in public high schools no later than 12/31/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Literacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateSigned by Governor
2021-05-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-25HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2021-05-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/25/2021)
2021-05-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-05-14HouseScheduled for consideration (05/19/2021)
2021-04-14HouseReferred to House Education
2021-04-13SenateSenate read and passed
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/13/2021)
2021-04-07SenateCommittee recommends passage
2021-04-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021)
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback