RI S0347 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows businesses that had an insurance policy in place for business interruption as of March 9, 2019 to recover from their insurance companies for a COVID-19 business impact.
Title
Covid-19 Pandemic Insurance Recovery Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0347.pdf |