RI S0346 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a protected area around recognized wildlife refuges in which hunting with weapons would be prohibited.
Title
Wildlife Refuges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0346.pdf |