RI S0345 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure -- Expungement Of Criminal Records (would Eliminate The Requirement That A Successful Petitioner Pay A $100 Fee In Order To Have All Records And Records Of Conviction Relating To The Conviction Expunged As Well As All Index And Other References To It Deleted)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure -- Expungement Of Criminal Records (would Eliminate The Requirement That A Successful Petitioner Pay A $100 Fee In Order To Have All Records And Records Of Conviction Relating To The Conviction Expunged As Well As All Index And Other References To It Deleted)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0345.pdf |