RI S0344 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus act regarding caterers, hide and leather inspection, constables, sterilization of bedding, mixed-martial arts and pool halls.
Title
Retail Licenses--small Business--omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |