RI S0341 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Elections
Title
An Act Relating To Elections
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-23 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-22 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-15 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-15 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-17 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-05-12 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0341.pdf |