RI S0338 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any person who has a retail sales permit would not be required to pay a separate registration fee to make sales at flea markets; provided, however, the person would remain responsible to pay all taxes due as a result of sales at a flea mkt.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--enforcement And Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |