RI S0332 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires medical treatment facilities to provide discharge plans for patients with nonsubstance abuse related mental health disorders.
Title
Comprehensive Discharge Planning
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |