RI S0330 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-28 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-28 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the health insurance commissioner to make recommendations to the general assembly to ensure compliance with mental health parity provisions required by existing law.
Title
The Rhode Island Health Care Reform Act Of 2004--health Insurance Oversight
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - 2004 -health insurance oversight approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |