RI S0330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts out-of-state food processors and wholesalers from the five hundred dollar ($500) fee charged to food processors and wholesalers by the department of health.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0330.pdf |