RI S0330 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Elections -- Registration Of Voters (would Allow Non-affiliated Party Voters To Vote In Party Primaries Without Becoming An Affiliated Party Voter)
Title
An Act Relating To Elections -- Registration Of Voters (would Allow Non-affiliated Party Voters To Vote In Party Primaries Without Becoming An Affiliated Party Voter)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0330.pdf |