RI S0323 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individuals employed in domestic service or in or about a private home to be included as an employee.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0323.pdf |