RI S0314 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Subtracts state tax refunds, paid to an individual in the previous year, from federal adjusted gross income, for purposes of the state income tax for tax years beginning January 1, 2018.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0314.pdf |