RI S0312 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends several sections of the Rhode Island Zoning Enabling Act of 1991 with the intent of preserving neighborhood character and promoting smart growth.
Title
Zoning Ordinances-neighborhood
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0312.pdf |