RI S0304 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs filing non-opiate directives with the DOA and deletes requirements for recording in electronic health record and verification by a registered practitioner. Replaces medical disciplinary board with the dept of health for compliance violations.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act -- Non-opiate Directive
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2019) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |