RI S0304 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and advertising of unhealthy food and beverage products in schools during the school day, since they do not meet minimum federal governmental nutrition standards.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils--food And Beverages
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0304.pdf |