RI S0303 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires smoking bar owners to demonstrate on a quarterly rather than annual basis that revenues generated from tobacco products exceeds revenue generated from food and beverage sales.
Title
Public Health And Workplace Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - And workplace safety act approval of amendment lc 001261/6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - And workplace safety act approval of amendment lc 001261/6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |