RI S0301 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state higher education institutions to waive application and transcript fees for veterans.
Title
Fees For State Colleges And Universities - Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0301.pdf |