RI S0296 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that on and after July 1, 2016, any city or town council would have the authority to exempt said city or town from the prohibition against the issuance of certain alcoholic beverage licenses within (200') of a school or place of public worship.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0296.pdf |