RI S0289 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the sunset provision of the interstate medical licensure act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Medical Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03HouseReferred to House Health & Human Services
2023-05-02SenateSenate read and passed
2023-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2023)
2023-04-25SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-04-20SenateScheduled for consideration (04/25/2023)
2023-04-17SenateMeeting postponed (04/18/2023)
2023-04-14SenateScheduled for consideration
2023-03-09SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023)
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback